Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Camacho y García

Deceased

Bishop of Querétaro, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1818Born
184122.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 186446.3AppointedBishop of Durango, México
22 Jun 186850.3AppointedBishop of Querétaro, México
4 Jul 186951.3Ordained BishopBishop of Querétaro, México
19 Jul 186951.3InstalledBishop of Querétaro, México
30 Jul 188466.4DiedBishop of Querétaro, México

MicroData Summary for Ramón Camacho y García (VIAF: 78092759)
Bishop Ramón Camacho y García (born , died ) Bishop of Querétaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEtzatlán, Diocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco
Ordained BishopCathedral, Morelia, Archdiocese of Michoacán

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 474
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1869, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017