Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Maríe del Refugio Guerra y Alva

Deceased

Bishop of Zacatecas, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1827Born
16 Mar 185123.3Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jul 187244.6AppointedBishop of Zacatecas, México
29 Dec 187245.1Ordained BishopBishop of Zacatecas, México
15 Feb 187345.2InstalledBishop of Zacatecas, México
28 Apr 188860.4DiedBishop of Zacatecas, México

MicroData Summary for José Maríe del Refugio Guerra y Alva
Bishop José Maríe del Refugio Guerra y Alva (born , died ) Bishop of Zacatecas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoaquixtli, Diocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco
Ordained BishopN.D. de le Guadeloupe, Mexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 600
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 106

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017