Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Antonio Laureano de Zubiría y Escalante

Deceased

Bishop of Durango, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1791Born
1817¹25.4Ordained PriestPriest
19 Oct 183039.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Daulia
28 Feb 183139.6AppointedBishop of Durango, México
28 Aug 183140.1Ordained BishopBishop of Durango, México
2 Oct 183140.2InstalledBishop of Durango, México
28 Nov 186372.3DiedBishop of Durango, México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for José Antonio Laureano de Zubiría y Escalante
Bishop José Antonio Laureano de Zubiría y Escalante (born , died ) Bishop of Durango

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArispe
Ordained BishopLa Professa, Mexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 173, and Page 182
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1831, Number 18
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,326

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast