Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Cayetano José María Gómez de Portugal y Solis

Deceased

Bishop of Michoacán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1783BornSan Pedro Piedra Gorda
19 Oct 183047.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
28 Feb 183147.6AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
21 Aug 183148.1Ordained BishopBishop of Michoacán, México
4 Apr 185066.7DiedBishop of Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for Juan Cayetano José María Gómez de Portugal y Solis:
Bishop Juan Cayetano José María Gómez de Portugal y Solis (born , died ) Bishop of Michoacán

  • a bishop for 18.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 259, and Page 153

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013