Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Guerra y Rodríguez Correa

Deceased

Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1792BornSan Francisco de Campeche
25 Mar 181624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Yucatán (Mérida), México
17 Dec 183240.7AppointedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
25 Jul 183442.3Ordained BishopBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
28 Oct 183442.6InstalledBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
3 Feb 186370.9DiedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México

MicroData Summary for José María Guerra y Rodríguez Correa:
Bishop José María Guerra y Rodríguez Correa (born , died ) Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 401

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013