Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Miguel Gordoa y Barrios

Deceased

Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1777BornSierra de Pines
19 Oct 183053.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
19 Oct 183053.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Canea
28 Feb 183153.9AppointedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
21 Aug 183154.4Ordained BishopBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
12 Jul 183255.3DiedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for José Miguel Gordoa y Barrios:
Bishop José Miguel Gordoa y Barrios (born , died ) Bishop of Guadalajara

  • a bishop for .9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 62, and Page 207

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013