Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jonás Guerrero Corona

Bishop of Culiacán, Sinaloa, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1946 Born
6 Jul 197427.6Ordained PriestPriest of Autlán, Jalisco, México
27 Jun 200154.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
27 Jun 200154.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Assava
15 Aug 200154.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Assava
18 Mar 201164.3AppointedBishop of Culiacán, Sinaloa, México
14 Apr 201164.4InstalledBishop of Culiacán, Sinaloa, México

MicroData Summary for Jonás Guerrero Corona
Bishop Jonás Guerrero Corona (born ) Bishop of Culiacán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Chante

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Culiacán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2011
  • i: CB, 14 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast