Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María de Jesús Portugal y Serratos, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aguascalientes, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1838Born
16 Jun 186123.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
1 Oct 188850.6AppointedBishop of Sinaloa, México
8 Dec 188850.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sinaloa, México
16 Feb 188951.0InstalledBishop of Sinaloa, México
28 Nov 189860.8AppointedBishop of Saltillo, Coahuila, México
4 Apr 189961.1InstalledBishop of Saltillo, Coahuila, México
30 May 190264.3AppointedBishop of Aguascalientes, México
29 Jul 190264.5InstalledBishop of Aguascalientes, México
27 Nov 191274.8DiedBishop of Aguascalientes, México

MicroData Summary for José María de Jesús Portugal y Serratos
Bishop José María de Jesús Portugal y Serratos O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Aguascalientes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMéxico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Ordained BishopGuadalajara, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 83, and Page 494
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 519
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017