Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Lázaro de la Garza y Ballesteros

Deceased

Archbishop of México, Federal District


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1785BornValle del Pilón
1815¹29.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 May 183751.4AppointedBishop of Sonora, México
8 Oct 183751.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sonora, México
30 Sep 185064.8AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
11 Mar 186276.2DiedArchbishop of México, Federal District

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Lázaro de la Garza y Ballesteros:
Archbishop José Lázaro de la Garza y Ballesteros (born , died ) Archbishop of México

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 382
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 349

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013