Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Francisco Escalante y Moreno

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sonora, México

Titular Bishop of Anastasiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1792Born
27 May 181926.9Ordained PriestPriest of Sonora, México
23 Mar 185562.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sonora, México
23 Mar 185562.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Anastasiopolis
3 Feb 185663.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anastasiopolis
2 Apr 187279.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Sonora, México

MicroData Summary for Juan Francisco Escalante y Moreno
Bishop Juan Francisco Escalante y Moreno (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sonora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAriopé, Diocese of Sonora

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 98
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017