Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio María de Jesús Campos Moreno

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Rhesaina

Titular See: (Abad de Guadalupe)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1770Born
19 Dec 183464.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhesaina
18 Oct 183564.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhesaina
12 Jan 185180.0DiedTitular Bishop of Rhesaina

MicroData Summary for Antonio María de Jesús Campos Moreno
Bishop Antonio María de Jesús Campos Moreno (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Rhesaina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Felipe del Obraje, Spain

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 322
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1835, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018