Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Agustín Domínguez y Díaz

Deceased

Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1790BornZaachila
19 Sep 181222.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
24 Sep 181424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
7 Apr 185463.9AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
27 Aug 185464.3Ordained BishopBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
11 Oct 185464.4InstalledBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
25 Jul 185969.2DiedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for José Agustín Domínguez y Díaz
Bishop José Agustín Domínguez y Díaz (born , died ) Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 105
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1854, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 Dec 2016