Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Paula Verea y González

Deceased

Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1813Born
12 Mar 183723.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Mar 183723.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 185339.5AppointedBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
13 Nov 185339.9Ordained BishopBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
26 Dec 185340.0InstalledBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
19 Sep 187965.7AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
23 Jan 188066.1InstalledBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
4 May 188470.3DiedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Paula Verea y González (VIAF: 7080506)
Bishop Francisco de Paula Verea y González (born , died ) Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnaleo, Diocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Guadalupe, Mexico City, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 344, and Page 557
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Jan 2017