Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de la Concepción Ramírez y González, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Tamaulipas, México

Titular Bishop of Corada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1825Born
23 Jul 186135.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Corada
4 Aug 186135.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corada
13 Aug 186135.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tamaulipas, México
18 Jun 186943.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Tamaulipas, México

MicroData Summary for Francisco de la Concepción Ramírez y González
Bishop Francisco de la Concepción Ramírez y González O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Tamaulipas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeón

  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 181
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1861, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Feb 2017