Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María de Jesús Díez de Sollano y Dávalos

Deceased

Bishop of León, Guanajuato, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1820Born
1 Jun 184423.5Ordained PriestPriest of México, Federal District
7 Apr 186241.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
7 Apr 186241.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Troas
19 Mar 186342.3AppointedBishop of León, Guanajuato, México
12 Jul 186342.6Ordained BishopBishop of León, Guanajuato, México
14 Feb 186443.2InstalledBishop of León, Guanajuato, México
7 Jun 188160.5DiedBishop of León, Guanajuato, México

MicroData Summary for José María de Jesús Díez de Sollano y Dávalos
Bishop José María de Jesús Díez de Sollano y Dávalos (born , died ) Bishop of León

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Miguel Allende
Ordained BishopCathedral, Mexico

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 338, and Page 568
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1863, Number 10
  • opd/c1: CB, 27 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Jul 2021

Quantcast