Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Gárate y López de Arizmendi

Deceased

Bishop of Querétaro, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1796Born
8 Dec 181923.3Ordained PriestPriest of México, Federal District
19 Mar 186366.5AppointedBishop of Querétaro, México
17 Apr 186467.6Ordained BishopBishop of Querétaro, México
31 Jul 186669.9DiedBishop of Querétaro, México

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Gárate y López de Arizmendi
Bishop Bernardo Gárate y López de Arizmendi (born , died ) Bishop of Querétaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMéxico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Ordained BishopSte Therese, México, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 473
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,864, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast