Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Posada y Garduño

Deceased

Archbishop of México, Federal District


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1780³Born
12 Apr 181938.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Apr 181938.5Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 183959.2AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
31 May 184059.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of México, Federal District
30 Apr 184665.5DiedArchbishop of México, Federal District

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Posada y Garduño
Archbishop Manuel Posada y Garduño (born , died ) Archbishop of México

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Felipe el Grande
Ordained BishopCathedral, México City, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a priest for 27.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 263
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,840, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast