Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel del Conde y Blanco

Deceased

Bishop of San Luis Potosí, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1816Born
183922.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 186953.3AppointedBishop of San Luis Potosí, México
20 May 187054.2Ordained BishopBishop of San Luis Potosí, México
21 Jun 187256.3DiedBishop of San Luis Potosí, México

MicroData Summary for Manuel del Conde y Blanco
Bishop Manuel del Conde y Blanco (born , died ) Bishop of San Luis Potosí

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Luis Potosi, Diocese of San Luis Potosí
Ordained BishopCathedral, San Luis Potosi, Diocese of San Luis Potosí

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 353
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017