Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emigdio Duarte Figueroa

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Culiacán, Sinaloa

Titular Bishop of Bilta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1968 BornGuamuchil
29 Jun 199628.1Ordained PriestPriest of Culiacán, Sinaloa, México
15 Jan 200738.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Culiacán, Sinaloa, México
15 Jan 200738.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bilta
15 Mar 200738.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bilta
Sep 2010³42.3ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Culiacán, Sinaloa, México

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emigdio Duarte Figueroa:
Bishop Emigdio Duarte Figueroa (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Culiacán

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Culiacán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,348
  • r: CB, 14 Apr 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013