Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Ulises Macías Salcedo

Archbishop of Hermosillo, Sonora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1940 BornLeón
10 Apr 196625.4Ordained PriestPriest of León, Guanajuato, México
14 Jun 198443.6AppointedBishop of Mexicali, Baja California Norte, México
29 Jul 198443.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mexicali, Baja California Norte, México
20 Aug 199655.8AppointedArchbishop of Hermosillo, Sonora, México
29 Oct 199656.0InstalledArchbishop of Hermosillo, Sonora, México

MicroData Summary for José Ulises Macías Salcedo:
Archbishop José Ulises Macías Salcedo (born ) Archbishop of Hermosillo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Hermosillo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013