Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Mexicali

Dioecesis Mexicalensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 25 March 1966
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Tijuana
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Baja California Norte
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 59,000 (22,788 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Noroeste
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesismxli.org/
  • Mailing Address: Av. Morelos 192, Apartado 3-547, 21100 Mexicali, B.C. Norte, México
  • Telephone: (65)552-4009
  • Fax: 552-4596

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
25 March 1966ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Tijuana Diocese of Mexicali (erected)
25 November 2006Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Mexicali (from Hermosillo)
26 January 2007Territory LostDiocese of Mexicali
Archdiocese of Tijuana
Diocese of Ensenada (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1966383,467.0%111728010ap1967
1970600,000656,70091.4%35124712,7651416324ap1971
1976685,620761,83190.0%31195013,7122715032ap1977
1980719,178900,00079.9%33255812,3993317733ap1981
19901,349,0001,622,00083.2%60248416,0592815541ap1991
19991,286,4551,524,24984.4%882711511,1865015243ap2000
20001,376,4551,618,15085.1%872210912,62815115149ap2001
20011,085,0821,379,52578.7%96271238,82114515049ap2002
20021,181,9071,521,98477.7%101271289,23314515649ap2003
20031,245,5581,516,84582.1%112281408,89617114449ap2004
20041,317,5331,705,00177.3%1002112110,88815913951ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 13 Jul 2013