Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sigifredo Noriega Barceló

Bishop of Zacatecas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1951 BornGranados
7 Oct 197625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ciudad Obregón, Sonora, México
26 Jan 200755.3AppointedBishop of Ensenada, Baja California Norte, México
25 Apr 200755.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ensenada, Baja California Norte, México
2 Aug 201260.8AppointedBishop of Zacatecas, México
2 Oct 201261.0InstalledBishop of Zacatecas, México

MicroData Summary for Sigifredo Noriega Barceló:
Bishop Sigifredo Noriega Barceló (born ) Bishop of Zacatecas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zacatecas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,408
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Aug 2012
  • i: CB, 3 Aug 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013