Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente García Bernal

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Obregón, Sonora, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1929Born
4 Apr 195323.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 198858.9AppointedBishop of Ciudad Obregón, Sonora, México
24 May 198859.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Obregón, Sonora, México
8 Nov 200576.5RetiredBishop of Ciudad Obregón, Sonora, México
26 Nov 201788.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Ciudad Obregón, Sonora, México

MicroData Summary for Vicente García Bernal
Bishop Vicente García Bernal (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Obregón

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFresnillo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ciudad Obregón, Diocese of Ciudad Obregón, Sonora
Death PlaceClinica San José, Hospital, Ciudad Obregón, Diocese of Ciudad Obregón, Sonora

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Nov 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,809
  • d: CB, 26 Nov 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast