Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Javier Cardinal Lozano Barragán

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers

Cardinal-Deacon of San Michele Arcangelo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1933 BornToluca
30 Oct 195522.8Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jun 197946.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
5 Jun 197946.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thinisa in Numidia
15 Aug 197946.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thinisa in Numidia
28 Oct 198451.8AppointedBishop of Zacatecas, México
31 Oct 199663.8ResignedBishop of Zacatecas, México
7 Jan 199763.9AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers
21 Oct 200370.7Elevated to Cardinal
21 Oct 200370.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Michele Arcangelo
2 Apr 200572.2CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers
21 Apr 200572.2ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers
18 Apr 200976.2RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers

MicroData Summary for Javier Lozano Barragán:
Cardinal Javier Lozano Barragán (born ) President Emeritus of Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers

Please contact the Cardinal through the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013