Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodoro Enrique Pino Miranda

Deceased

Bishop of Huajuapan de León, Oaxaca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1946Born
2 Apr 197225.3Ordained PriestPriest of Hermosillo, Sonora, México
2 Dec 200054.0AppointedBishop of Huajuapan de León, Oaxaca, México
31 Jan 200154.1Ordained BishopBishop of Huajuapan de León, Oaxaca, México
2 Jul 202073.5DiedBishop of Huajuapan de León, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for Teodoro Enrique Pino Miranda
Bishop Teodoro Enrique Pino Miranda (born , died ) Bishop of Huajuapan de León

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCucurpe
Ordained BishopCathedral, Huajuapan de León, Diocese of Huajuapan de León, Oaxaca
Death PlaceHuajuapan de León, Diocese of Huajuapan de León, Oaxaca

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,894
  • d: CB, 2 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 3 Jul 2020

Quantcast