Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anselmo Zarza Bernal

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of León, Guanajuato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1916BornAtlixco
8 Apr 193922.8Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 196245.9AppointedBishop of Linares, Nuevo León, México
22 Aug 196246.2Ordained BishopBishop of Linares, Nuevo León, México
13 Jan 196649.6AppointedBishop of León, Guanajuato, México
4 Jan 199275.5RetiredBishop of León, Guanajuato, México
15 Apr 201497.8DiedBishop Emeritus of León, Guanajuato, México

MicroData Summary for Anselmo Zarza Bernal:
Bishop Anselmo Zarza Bernal (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of León

  • a priest for 75.0 years
  • a bishop for 51.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 122
  • d: CB, 15 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 20 Dec 2014