Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Jesús Aguilera Rodriguez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Huajuapan de León, Oaxaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1931Born
9 Apr 195524.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jun 198251.1AppointedBishop of Huajuapan de León, Oaxaca, México
10 Aug 198251.3Ordained BishopBishop of Huajuapan de León, Oaxaca, México
8 Mar 199159.9RetiredBishop of Huajuapan de León, Oaxaca, México
9 Nov 199968.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Huajuapan de León, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for José de Jesús Aguilera Rodriguez:
Bishop José de Jesús Aguilera Rodriguez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Huajuapan de León

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013