Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Braulio Rafael León Villegas

Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Guzmán, Jalisco, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1943 Born
17 May 197027.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 199046.9AppointedBishop of La Paz en la Baja California Sur, México
29 Mar 199047.0Ordained BishopBishop of La Paz en la Baja California Sur, México
11 Dec 199956.7AppointedBishop of Ciudad Guzmán, Jalisco, México
25 Sep 201774.4RetiredBishop of Ciudad Guzmán, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Braulio Rafael León Villegas
Bishop Braulio Rafael León Villegas (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Guzmán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeón, Diocese of León, Guanajuato
Ordained BishopCathedral, La Paz, Diocese of La Paz en la Baja California Sur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ciudad Guzmán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,063
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018