Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of La Paz en la Baja California Sur

Dioecesis Paciensis in California Inferiori Meridionali



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 21 March 1988
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Tijuana
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Baja California Sur
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 73,677 (28,457 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Noroeste
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesislapaz.org/
  • Mailing Address: Apartado 25, Revolución y 5 de Mayo, 23000 La Paz, Baja California Sur, México
  • Telephone: (112)2-25-96
  • Fax: 2-82-72

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of La Paz en la Baja California Sur
13 April 1957ErectedVicariate Apostolic of California Inferiore Prefecture Apostolic of La Paz en la Baja California Sur (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of La Paz en la Baja California Sur
1 March 1976ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of La Paz en la Baja California Sur Vicariate Apostolic of La Paz en la Baja California Sur
Diocese of La Paz en la Baja California Sur
21 March 1988ErectedVicariate Apostolic of La Paz en la Baja California Sur Diocese of La Paz en la Baja California Sur (erected)
25 November 2006Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of La Paz en la Baja California Sur (from Hermosillo)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of La Paz en la Baja California Sur
196688,50089,00099.4%324273,277317613ap1967
1970144,150145,00099.4%27275,33835108ap1971
Vicariate Apostolic of La Paz en la Baja California Sur
1976151,900155,00098.0%229314,9003611516ap1977
1980258,800266,00097.3%1225376,9943215822ap1981
Diocese of La Paz en la Baja California Sur
1990253,000262,00096.6%1824426,0232717721ap1991
1999375,000395,00094.9%3028586,4653118922ap2000
2000375,500395,50094.9%3228606,2583118925ap2001
2001378,000398,50094.9%3328616,1963118925ap2002
2002381,637424,04190.0%3624606,3602418627ap2003
2003472,500525,00090.0%4024647,3822419340ap2004
2004512,200535,00095.7%4019598,6811914842ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013