Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustín Aguirre y Ramos

Deceased

Bishop of Sinaloa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1867BornSan Sebastián
3 Dec 189326.6Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 192255.1AppointedBishop of Sinaloa, México
1 Oct 192255.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sinaloa, México
11 Dec 192255.6InstalledBishop of Sinaloa, México
7 May 194275.0DiedBishop of Sinaloa, México

MicroData Summary for Agustín Aguirre y Ramos:
Bishop Agustín Aguirre y Ramos (born , died ) Bishop of Sinaloa

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013