Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Guadalupe Ortíz y López

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Monterrey, Nuevo León

Titular Archbishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1867BornMomáx
1891²23.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 191951.1AppointedBishop of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas, Tamaulipas, México
8 Jun 191951.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas, Tamaulipas, México
17 Jul 191951.5InstalledBishop of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas, Tamaulipas, México
8 Jun 192355.4AppointedBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México
26 Mar 192658.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
26 Mar 192658.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ancusa
20 Sep 192961.7AppointedArchbishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
18 Jan 193062.0InstalledArchbishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
27 Apr 194072.3ResignedArchbishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
27 Apr 194072.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia
5 Dec 195183.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Guadalupe Ortíz y López:
Archbishop José Guadalupe Ortíz y López (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Monterrey

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015