Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lino Aguirre Garcia

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Culiacán, Sinaloa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1895BornMezticacán
9 Nov 191924.1Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jan 194448.3AppointedBishop of Sinaloa, México
12 Mar 194448.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sinaloa, México
20 Aug 196973.9RetiredBishop of Culiacán, Sinaloa, México
20 Aug 196973.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Flaviae
31 Dec 197075.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Aquae Flaviae
20 Feb 197579.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Culiacán, Sinaloa, México

MicroData Summary for Lino Aguirre Garcia:
Bishop Lino Aguirre Garcia (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Culiacán

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013