Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Jerónimo Yerena y Camarena

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Huejutla, Hidalgo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1886BornMirandilla de Mascota
11 Dec 191024.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jul 194053.8AppointedBishop of Huejutla, Hidalgo, México
15 Sep 194054.0Ordained BishopBishop of Huejutla, Hidalgo, México
8 Oct 194054.0InstalledBishop of Huejutla, Hidalgo, México
19 Aug 196376.9RetiredBishop of Huejutla, Hidalgo, México
19 Aug 196376.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Boseta
2 Feb 197184.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Boseta
13 Dec 197387.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Huejutla, Hidalgo, México

MicroData Summary for Manuel Jerónimo Yerena y Camarena:
Bishop Manuel Jerónimo Yerena y Camarena (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Huejutla

  • a priest for 63.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013