Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Homobono Anaya y Gutiérrez

Deceased

Bishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1836Born
3 Mar 186023.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 189862.0AppointedBishop of Sinaloa, México
12 Feb 189962.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sinaloa, México
20 Mar 189962.3InstalledBishop of Sinaloa, México
9 Nov 190265.9AppointedBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México
11 Dec 190266.0InstalledBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México
10 Dec 190670.0DiedBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México

MicroData Summary for José Homobono Anaya y Gutiérrez (VIAF: 58371711)
Bishop José Homobono Anaya y Gutiérrez (born , died ) Bishop of Chilapa

EventPlace
Birth PlacePegueros, Diocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco
Ordained BishopGuadalajara, Diocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco
Death PlaceChilapa, Diocese of Chilapa, Guerrero

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 202, and Page 519
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,899, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast