Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Guadalupe de Jesús Alva y Franco, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Zacatecas, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1841Born
7 Aug 186422.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
28 Dec 189857.2AppointedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
26 Feb 189957.3Ordained BishopBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
30 Apr 189957.5InstalledBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
14 Dec 189958.1AppointedBishop of Zacatecas, México
8 Mar 190058.4InstalledBishop of Zacatecas, México
11 Jul 191068.7DiedBishop of Zacatecas, México

MicroData Summary for José Guadalupe de Jesús Alva y Franco (VIAF: 73646153)
Bishop José Guadalupe de Jesús Alva y Franco O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Zacatecas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Antonio
Ordained BishopLa Profession, Church, Mexico City, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 599, and Page 600
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017