Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola Averardi

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Tarsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1843Born
22 Sep 186623.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 189552.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
22 Dec 189552.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
11 Mar 192480.8DiedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus

MicroData Summary for Nicola Averardi
Archbishop Nicola Averardi (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Tarsus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSant'Egidio

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1925
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 537

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017