Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maximiano Reynoso y del Corral

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México

Titular Bishop of Neocaesarea in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1841Born
30 Nov 187635.2Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 189857.2AppointedBishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
26 Feb 189957.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
8 Mar 189957.5InstalledBishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
22 Jan 190260.4ResignedBishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
25 Jun 190361.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Neocaesarea in Syria
19 Mar 191068.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México

MicroData Summary for Maximiano Reynoso y del Corral
Bishop Maximiano Reynoso y del Corral (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tulancingo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSilao
Ordained BishopLa Profession, Church, Mexico City, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a priest for 33.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 406, and Page 572
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017