Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henri-Victor Altmayer, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Baghdad, Iraq

Titular Archbishop of Synnada in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1844Born
4 Apr 188439.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chalcis in Syria
4 Apr 188439.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to Mesopotamia, Kurdistan, and Lesser Armenia, Iraq
5 Aug 188439.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Baghdad, Iraq
10 Aug 188439.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Chalcis in Syria
24 Nov 188742.9SucceededArchbishop of Baghdad, Iraq
23 Aug 1902³57.7ResignedArchbishop of Baghdad, Iraq
28 Aug 190257.7ResignedApostolic Delegate to Mesopotamia, Kurdistan, and Lesser Armenia, Iraq
28 Aug 190257.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Synnada in Phrygia
12 Nov 193085.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Baghdad, Iraq

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henri-Victor Altmayer (VIAF: 316448446)
Archbishop Henri-Victor Altmayer O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Baghdad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBouzonville, France
Ordained BishopSte Glossinde, Metz, Diocese of Metz, France

  • a bishop for 46.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 137, and Page 197
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 531
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jun 2017