Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Desanti

Deceased

Bishop of Ajaccio, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1846Born
18 Dec 186923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ajaccio, France
13 Jul 190659.5AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
12 Aug 190659.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
12 Feb 191669.1DiedBishop of Ajaccio, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Desanti
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Desanti (born , died ) Bishop of Ajaccio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAjaccio

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 36
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018