Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Gonzalez Carlo Duval, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

Titular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina

Apostolic Delegate to Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1833BornTulle
20 Sep 185623.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jul 187339.9ProfessedPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
29 Nov 189562.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Alep [Beroea, Halab], Syria
29 Nov 189562.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
22 Dec 189562.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
25 Feb 189662.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Syria
31 Jul 190471.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Alep [Beroea, Halab], Syria

MicroData Summary for Pietro Gonzalez Carlo Duval:
Archbishop Pietro Gonzalez Carlo Duval O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 449

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013