Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jacinto López y Romo

Deceased

Archbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1831Born
1 Apr 185523.5Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 188654.7AppointedBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
29 Aug 188654.9Ordained BishopBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
24 Nov 188655.2InstalledBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
13 Aug 189159.9AppointedArchbishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
17 Nov 189160.1InstalledArchbishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
14 Dec 189968.2AppointedArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
3 Mar 190068.4InstalledArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
31 Dec 190069.3DiedArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Jacinto López y Romo (VIAF: 160634406)
Archbishop Jacinto López y Romo (born , died ) Archbishop of Guadalajara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEncarnación, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco
Ordained BishopGuadalajara, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 292, and Page 344
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017