Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Rojas Mena

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Culiacán, Sinaloa, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1917Born
31 Mar 194527.7Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 196850.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Culiacán, Sinaloa, México
6 May 196850.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Accia
16 Jun 196850.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Accia
20 Aug 196952.1AppointedBishop of Culiacán, Sinaloa, México
4 Oct 199376.2ResignedBishop of Culiacán, Sinaloa, México
18 Mar 200991.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Culiacán, Sinaloa, México

MicroData Summary for Luis Rojas Mena
Bishop Luis Rojas Mena (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Culiacán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJalapa de Cánovas

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Jan 2017