Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Everardo López Alcocer

Deceased

Bishop of Autlán, Jalisco, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1916Born
4 Apr 194226.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jul 196751.4AppointedBishop of Autlán, Jalisco, México
29 Sep 196751.6Ordained BishopBishop of Autlán, Jalisco, México
19 Dec 196852.8DiedBishop of Autlán, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Everardo López Alcocer
Bishop Everardo López Alcocer (born , died ) Bishop of Autlán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTototlàn

  • a priest for 26.7 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast