Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario De Santis

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Troia, Italy

Titular Bishop of Aeca

Auxiliary Bishop of Bovino

Auxiliary Bishop of Foggia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1904Born
22 Mar 193126.4Ordained PriestPriest of Troia, Italy
8 Apr 196762.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Troia, Italy
8 Apr 196762.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Heraclea
8 Apr 196762.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bovino, Italy
24 Jun 196762.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Heraclea
14 Dec 197470.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Aeca
14 Dec 197470.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Foggia, Italy
17 Jan 198580.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Troia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario De Santis
Bishop Mario De Santis (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Troia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTroia

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1985

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018