Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Renato Luisi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nicastro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1903Born
10 Aug 192723.7Ordained PriestPriest of Foggia, Italy
17 Dec 195956.1AppointedBishop of Bovino, Italy
28 Feb 196056.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bovino, Italy
30 Jun 196359.6AppointedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
1 Jun 196864.5ResignedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
1 Jun 196864.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Catula
22 May 197773.5ResignedTitular Bishop of Catula
17 Nov 198582.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Nicastro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Renato Luisi
Bishop Renato Luisi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nicastro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelluccio Valmaggiore

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018