Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michele Mincuzzi

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Lecce, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1913Born
25 Jul 193623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
19 Jul 196653.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
19 Jul 196653.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinnipsa
2 Oct 196653.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinnipsa
12 Oct 197461.3AppointedBishop of Ugento-Santa Maria di Leuca, Italy
27 Jan 198167.6AppointedArchbishop of Lecce, Italy
5 Apr 198167.7InstalledArchbishop of Lecce, Italy
7 Dec 198875.4RetiredArchbishop of Lecce, Italy
3 Jun 199783.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Lecce, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Mincuzzi
Archbishop Michele Mincuzzi (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lecce

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBari, Archdiocese of Bari (-Canosa)
Ordained BishopN.-D. de l'Assomption, Cathedral, Bari, Archdiocese of Bari (-Canosa)
Death PlaceBari, Archdiocese of Bari-Bitonto

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • i/c1: CB, 5 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Sep 2021

Quantcast