Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Bello

Deceased

Bishop of Molfetta-Ruvo-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1935Born
7 Jul 195722.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ugento, Italy
8 Dec 195722.7Ordained PriestPriest of Ugento, Italy
10 Aug 198247.3AppointedBishop of Molfetta, Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy
30 Sep 198247.5AppointedBishop of Ruvo, Italy
30 Oct 198247.6Ordained BishopBishop of Molfetta, Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy
21 Nov 198247.6InstalledBishop of Molfetta, Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy
30 Sep 198651.5AppointedBishop of Molfetta-Ruvo-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy
20 Apr 199358.0DiedBishop of Molfetta-Ruvo-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Bello (VIAF: 44445118)
Bishop Antonio Bello (born , died ) Bishop of Molfetta-Ruvo-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlessano, Diocese of Ugento
Ordained DeaconChurch, Montesardo, Diocese of Ugento
Ordained PriestCollegiata del S.S. Salvatore, Alessano, Diocese of Ugento
Ordained BishopTricase, Diocese of Ugento-Santa Maria di Leuca
Death PlaceMolfetta, Diocese of Molfetta-Ruvo-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi
Buried Place (Original)Alessano, Diocese of Ugento-Santa Maria di Leuca

  • a priest for 35.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • od/c01/loc: AM, 3 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast