Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Ruotolo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ugento-Santa Maria di Leuca, Italy

Titular Bishop of Atella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1898Born
17 Jun 192223.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Dec 193739.0AppointedBishop of Ugento, Italy
20 Feb 193839.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ugento, Italy
9 Nov 196869.9ResignedBishop of Ugento-Santa Maria di Leuca, Italy
9 Nov 196869.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Atella
11 Jun 197071.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Ugento-Santa Maria di Leuca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Ruotolo
Bishop Giuseppe Ruotolo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ugento-Santa Maria di Leuca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAndria

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • r: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 61, Page 99
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018