Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aldo Garzia

Deceased

Bishop of Nard˛-Gallipoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1926Born
30 Jul 195024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Nard˛, Italy
7 Oct 197549.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Molfetta, Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy
7 Oct 197549.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Assidona
7 Dec 197549.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Assidona
18 Mar 197851.8SucceededBishop of Molfetta, Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy
15 Jun 198256.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nard˛, Italy
15 Jun 198256.1AppointedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
30 Sep 198357.4SucceededBishop of Nard˛, Italy
30 Sep 198660.4AppointedBishop of Nard˛-Gallipoli, Italy
17 Dec 199468.6DiedBishop of Nard˛-Gallipoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Aldo Garzia
Bishop Aldo Garzia (born , died ) Bishop of Nard˛-Gallipoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParabita

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast