Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Innocenzo Alfredo Russo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bovino

Titular Bishop of Pegae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1882BornNapoli
17 Jun 190522.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
13 Mar 193754.3AppointedBishop of Bovino, Italy
25 Apr 193754.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bovino, Italy
9 Dec 195977.1RetiredBishop of Bovino, Italy
9 Dec 195977.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Pegae
12 Feb 197390.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Bovino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Innocenzo Alfredo Russo:
Bishop Innocenzo Alfredo Russo O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bovino

  • a priest for 67.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1974
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013